U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Witness List]
  • August 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 28, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • August 24, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • August 24, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • August 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • August 24, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 24, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • August 24, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • August 24, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • August 24, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • August 24, 2020: [Indictment - Sealed]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 24, 2020: [Seal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.