U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lowman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • November 10, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
  • November 10, 2021: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • November 10, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 25, 2020: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • August 25, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.