U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crane
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • April 01, 2022: [Exit Record]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 19, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order]
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 29, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • August 25, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.