U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crest
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [AEDPA - Election Form]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order - AEDPA]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • June 29, 2022: [Vacate - 2255]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 05, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Remark]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 04, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.