U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 20, 2021: [Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 12, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • April 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 28, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 21, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • September 14, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.