U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Status Report ]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 05, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • November 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 03, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • September 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 15, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 15, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • September 15, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • September 15, 2020: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.