U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • April 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 29, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order for Jury Lunch]
  • April 28, 2021: [Exhibits Returned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • April 28, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Jury Trial Held]
  • April 23, 2021: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • April 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 22, 2021: [Remark]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • April 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 06, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • April 06, 2021: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • April 06, 2021: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 12, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • February 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • November 06, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 30, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • September 25, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • September 25, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • September 25, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.