U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • June 27, 2022: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Return of Property - PostTrial]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Declaration]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • February 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Oral Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • September 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • June 25, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 11, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2021: [Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 30, 2021: [Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [SO ORDERED - for stipulation only]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2021: [Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 24, 2020: [SO ORDERED - for stipulation only]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • November 18, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 13, 2020: [Exclude]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 09, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 29, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • September 25, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.