U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00040-2
  • Case Name: USA v. McIntosh et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Declaration]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [SO ORDERED - for stipulation only]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2023: [Stipulation]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • December 13, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 28, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Remark]
  • July 25, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • July 25, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2022: [--Transcript]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 12, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 10, 2022: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 25, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • April 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Oral Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 31, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 22, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 22, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 27, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 22, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • July 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 06, 2021: [Exclude]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 27, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2021: [Exclude]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 04, 2021: [Exclude]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 29, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2020: [Exclude]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 24, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2020: [SO ORDERED - for stipulation only]
  • November 02, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2020: [Stipulation]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order]
  • September 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.