U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mathis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 10, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Remark]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 01, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 24, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 26, 2021: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 26, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • January 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.