U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zarco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • May 13, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.