U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Freeman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • December 19, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 12, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • September 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Writ Returned Executed]
  • September 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • August 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • August 13, 2021: [Warrant ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • August 13, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.