U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bostic
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Remark]
  • June 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 16, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 13, 2021: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • September 13, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.