U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hinojosa - Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 23, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • March 23, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • February 23, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 22, 2022: [Rule 20 - Transfer In]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.