U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pereira - Gonsalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • December 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 04, 2022: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • March 11, 2022: [Warrant ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • March 11, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.