U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2023: [Exclude]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • May 11, 2022: [Produce]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • April 08, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • March 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.