U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01074
  • Case Name: Oswald et al v. American Biltrite, Inc., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 09, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Parties and their Attorneys]
  • March 26, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Joinder]
  • March 20, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Parties and their Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.