U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00121
  • Case Name: LiTL LLC v. Dell Technologies Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 06, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [- Transcript]
  • April 23, 2025: [Discovery Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 16, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Letter]
  • October 10, 2024: [Markman Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Letter]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.