U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00679
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Delaware River and Bay Authority et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 25, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • October 07, 2024: [Crossclaim]
  • October 07, 2024: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.