U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00348
  • Case Name: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association v. Argus Information & Advisory Services Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 26, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice - Other]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 09, 2024: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • October 08, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • October 07, 2024: [Request for Oral Argument]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.