U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00404
  • Case Name: Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. v. OmniComm USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 12, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 12, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order - General]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Staying Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.