U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00594
  • Case Name: National Steel Car Limited v. FreightCar America, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 22, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory]
  • April 16, 2025: [Letters Rogatory]
  • April 16, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 15, 2025: [Letters Rogatory]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: [Complaint - Amended]
  • March 28, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 27, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Request for Oral Argument]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.