U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01077
  • Case Name: Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLC v. Realty Financial Resources, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Appellants Reply Brief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appendix]
  • April 04, 2025: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Appellees Brief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation of Record]
  • October 07, 2024: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.