U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00784
  • Case Name: Veloxis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Alkem Laboratories Ltd.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Claim Construction Briefing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • October 07, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2024: [Counterclaim]
  • October 07, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 07, 2024: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.