U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01059
  • Case Name: Corteva Agriscience LLC et al v. Inari Agriculture, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 05, 2025: [Claim Construction Reply Brief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 21, 2025: [Claim Construction Answering Brief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [- Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • March 21, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • March 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 21, 2025: [Claim Construction Opening Brief]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2024: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • October 08, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • October 08, 2024: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2024: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.