U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Olivere v. NAI Saturn Eastern, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Scheduling Order - General]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.