U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00921
  • Case Name: Ly v. Airbnb, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Certification of Direct Appeal to Court of Appeals]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 01, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 07, 2024: [Expedite]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.