U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00831
  • Case Name: AlmondNet, Inc. et al v. LiveIntent, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 07, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss/Other]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 04, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Counterclaim]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • October 09, 2024: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • October 08, 2024: [Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • October 07, 2024: [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.