U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00401
  • Case Name: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Nanjing Noratech Pharmaceutical Co., Limited
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 02, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 02, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 04, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [USCA Order - non-dispositive]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.