U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00605
  • Case Name: King of Sweets Online, Inc. v. Kervan USA, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • March 17, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2024: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Redacted Document]
  • October 09, 2024: [Deficiency Notice]
  • October 08, 2024: [Redacted Document]
  • October 08, 2024: [Deficiency re Redacted Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.