U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Shionogi & Co., Ltd. et al v. Norwich Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 09, 2024: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 08, 2024: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.