U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00856
  • Case Name: Stirista, LLC v. Skydeo Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment - Consent]
  • March 27, 2025: [Consent Judgment - Proposed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 14, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Staying Case]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.