U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01044
  • Case Name: Artistic Industries, LLC et al v. Walmart, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2025: [Default (Request for Clerk's Entry of Default)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 18, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • March 12, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • October 10, 2024: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • October 08, 2024: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.