U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Grange Holdings Inc. v. Kansas City Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 14, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Statement]
  • May 09, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 09, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • May 09, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 08, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [-SET ANSWERING BRIEF - no open brief w/ Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Preclude]
  • May 02, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 02, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 02, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 17, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Deficiency Notice]
  • April 13, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 11, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 11, 2025: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 11, 2025: [Preclude]
  • April 11, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 10, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2024: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.