U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Hobson v. The United States Department of State Diplomatic Security Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brief - Sur-Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Brief - Reply]
  • October 08, 2024: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.