U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00596
  • Case Name: Nash v. Qualtrics International Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • May 05, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • May 01, 2025: [Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 10, 2025: [Remark]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 25, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 18, 2025: [Letter]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.