U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00615
  • Case Name: Community Legal Aid Society, Inc. v. Adult and Prison Education Resources Workgroup et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 01, 2025: [Substitute Party]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.