U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00731
  • Case Name: Street Retail LLC v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • May 08, 2025: [Proposed Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.