U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01114
  • Case Name: Vertiv Corporation v. CyberPower Systems (USA), Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • April 21, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • March 12, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 08, 2024: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • October 08, 2024: [Summons Issued - Electronic Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
  • October 08, 2024: [Magistrate Consent Forms]
  • October 08, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.