U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Apotex Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 12, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • May 06, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 02, 2025: [- Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 13, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Report]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Joint Claim Construction Brief]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.