U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. v. Nengda Microelectronics (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • May 07, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Setting Videoconference]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • May 02, 2025: [Compel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [- Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 20, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 17, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • March 14, 2025: [Compel]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.