U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00960
  • Case Name: DRB Systems, LLC v. Sonny's Enterprises, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Discovery Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 08, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Deficiency re Redacted Documents]
  • April 01, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.