U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fountain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 30, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 22, 2025: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 11, 2025: [--Transcript]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice - Other]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.