U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00158
  • Case Name: Aortic Innovations LLC v. Edwards Lifesciences Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule - open, ans, reply, surreply]
  • May 12, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 09, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • May 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 08, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 05, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preclude]
  • April 16, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 08, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 08, 2025: [Preclude]
  • April 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 28, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 21, 2025: [- Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 21, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Oral Argument]
  • March 17, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 13, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Declaration]
November, 2024
  • November 27, 2024: [Declaration]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.