U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00320
  • Case Name: Carber et al v. Manor Care et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 03, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 03, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Deficiency Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Proposed Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.