U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Nielsen Company (US), LLC v. Hyphametrics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • May 12, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 12, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • May 09, 2025: [Statement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 06, 2025: [Brief - Sur-Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 10, 2025: [Statement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.