U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01124
  • Case Name: Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. v. Kurin, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 07, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Claim Construction Opening Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Claim Construction Surreply Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 08, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 21, 2025: [- Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2025: [Markman Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Claim Construction Chart]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • March 13, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 13, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 13, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 10, 2025: [Appendix]
  • March 10, 2025: [Joint Claim Construction Brief]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Local Counsel Letter]
  • October 10, 2024: [Case Transferred In from other District - Case Opening Event]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.