U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00951
  • Case Name: Oberlander v. New Castle County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases)]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Brief - Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.