U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00882
  • Case Name: Genzyme Corporation v. Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Proposed Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 13, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.