U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00649
  • Case Name: Optrascan, Inc. v. Morphle Labs, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • May 07, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Claim Construction Chart]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.